Company Overview
Summary of details
- CIN
- L63040DL1985PLC021324
- Company Status
- Amalgamated
- RoC
- RoC-Delhi
- Registration Number
- 21324
- Company Category
- Company limited by Shares
- Company Sub Category
- Non-govt company
- Class of Company
- Public
- Date of Incorporation
- 26/06/1985
- Activity
- Supporting and auxiliary transport activities; activities of travel agencies
Share capital
- Authorized Capital
- ₹1,490,000,000.00
- Paid up Capital
- ₹202,636,992.00
Contact details
- pankaj.dikshit@ge.com
GE CAPITAL TRANSPORTATION FINANCIAL SERV ICES LIMITED is a 39 years old company, incorporated on 26/06/1985. It is classified as Public Non-govt company. Its authorized share capital is ₹1,490,000,000.00 (₹14,900.00 Lakhs). Its paid up capital is ₹202,636,992.00 (₹2,026.37 Lakhs).
As per MCA the main line of business is Supporting and auxiliary transport activities; activities of travel agencies. Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is L63040DL1985PLC021324 and its registration number is 21324. It is registered at RoC-Delhi. The company is registered with email address pankaj.dikshit@ge.com. The company is incorporated with the address AIFACS BUILDING, 1, RAFI MARG, NEW DELHI DL 110001 IN. The current status of the company is Amalgamated.
Directors
Director name | DIN | Designation | Appointment | |
---|---|---|---|---|
VENKATA RAGHURAM RAJU KUNATHARAJU | 01741712 | Director | 25/07/1997 | View other directorships |
RAJAN RAY | 00045742 | Additional Director | 23/08/2007 | View other directorships |
KANWARPAL SINGH BINDRA | 01921245 | Managing Director | 30/11/2007 | View other directorships |
TEJPREET SINGH CHOPRA | 00317683 | Director | 16/06/2006 | View other directorships |
Similar Companies
Company | CIN | Address |
---|---|---|
OCTAVIUS PLANTATIONS LIMITED | L65910DL1984PLC018466 | E-40/3, OKHLA INDUSTRIAL AREA, PHASE-2 NEW DELHI NEW DELHI South Delhi DL 110020 IN |
Ancient leasing finance and investment company limited | L65910DL1984PLC017508 | SECTOR 'D' POCKET 6 BUILDING NO. 6013/2; G/F VASANT KUNJ; NEW DELHI; Delhi; 110070; India |
FAQ
The current board member of GE CAPITAL TRANSPORTATION FINANCIAL SERV ICES LIMITED are:
- VENKATA RAGHURAM RAJU KUNATHARAJU
- RAJAN RAY
- KANWARPAL SINGH BINDRA
- TEJPREET SINGH CHOPRA