Company Overview
Summary of details
- CIN
- L51900DN1993PLC000352
- Company Status
- Amalgamated
- RoC
- RoC-Ahmedabad
- Registration Number
- 352
- Company Category
- Company limited by Shares
- Company Sub Category
- Non-govt company
- Class of Company
- Public
- Date of Incorporation
- 17/12/1993
- Activity
- Other wholesale [Includes specialized wholesale not covered in any one of the previous categories and wholesale in a variety of goods without any particular specialization.]
Share capital
- Authorized Capital
- ₹1,000,000,000.00
- Paid up Capital
- ₹224,850,000.00
Contact details
- premkumar@alokind.com
GRABAL ALOK IMPEX LIMITED is a 30 years old company, incorporated on 17/12/1993. It is classified as Public Non-govt company. Its authorized share capital is ₹1,000,000,000.00 (₹10,000.00 Lakhs). Its paid up capital is ₹224,850,000.00 (₹2,248.50 Lakhs).
As per MCA the main line of business is Other wholesale [Includes specialized wholesale not covered in any one of the previous categories and wholesale in a variety of goods without any particular specialization.]. Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is L51900DN1993PLC000352 and its registration number is 352. It is registered at RoC-Ahmedabad. The company is registered with email address premkumar@alokind.com. The company is incorporated with the address 249/1, Village Vasona, Silvassa Dadar & Nagar Haveli DN 396230 IN. The current status of the company is Amalgamated.
Directors
Director name | DIN | Designation | Appointment | |
---|---|---|---|---|
CHANDRAKUMAR GOVINDRAM BUBNA | 00611031 | Director | 17/12/1993 | View other directorships |
SURINDER KUMAR BHOAN | 00435603 | Director | 30/01/2003 | View other directorships |
ASHOK BHAGIRATHMAL JIWRAJKA | 00168350 | Director | 17/12/1993 | View other directorships |
INDRU DHARAMDAS VASWANI | 01388817 | Director | 16/08/1995 | View other directorships |
DILIP BHAGIRATHMAL JIWRAJKA | 00173476 | Director | 17/12/1993 | View other directorships |
SURENDRA BHAGIRATHMAL JIWRAJKA | 00173525 | Managing Director | 17/12/1993 | View other directorships |
SURESH GIRDHARIDAS RAJANI | 00494837 | Director | 16/08/1995 | View other directorships |
ERICH WILHELM GRABHER | 02948860 | Director | 15/09/1994 | View other directorships |
Latest Documents
Date | Title | Size |
---|---|---|
08/12/2011 | XBRL document in respect of consolidated profit and loss account 30-11-2011 for the financial year ending on 31-03-2011.pdf.PDF | ? |
08/12/2011 | XBRL document in respect of consolidated balance sheet 30-11-2011 for the financial year ending on 31-03-2011.pdf.PDF | ? |
08/12/2011 | XBRL document in respect of balance sheet 30-11-2011 for the financial year ending on 31-03-2011.pdf.PDF | ? |
08/12/2011 | XBRL document in respect of profit and loss account 30-11-2011 for the financial year ending on 31-03-2011.pdf.PDF | ? |
03/12/2011 | Details of shareholders-031211.PDF | ? |
Similar Companies
Company | CIN | Address |
---|---|---|
MALWA MERCANTILE LIMITED. | L51909DL1985PLC022491 | M-79, 1st FLOOR, M-BLOCK MARKET GREATER KAILASH-II NEW DELHI South Delhi DL 110048 IN |
Regent realtech limited | L51909DL1985PLC022270 | MEZZANINE FLOORHEMKUNT TOWER; 98 NEHRU PLACE; NEW DELHI; Delhi; 110019; India |
RCS PARIVAR FINANCE LIMITED | L51909DL1985PLC021466 | 911/912;ARUNACHAL BUILDING; 19;BARAKHAMBA ROAD; NEW DELHI; Delhi; 110001; India |
FAQ
The current board member of GRABAL ALOK IMPEX LIMITED are:
- CHANDRAKUMAR GOVINDRAM BUBNA
- SURINDER KUMAR BHOAN
- ASHOK BHAGIRATHMAL JIWRAJKA
- INDRU DHARAMDAS VASWANI
- DILIP BHAGIRATHMAL JIWRAJKA
- SURENDRA BHAGIRATHMAL JIWRAJKA
- SURESH GIRDHARIDAS RAJANI
- ERICH WILHELM GRABHER