Company Overview
Summary of details
- CIN
- U29295TZ2002PLC015239
- Company Status
- Amalgamated
- RoC
- RoC-Coimbatore
- Registration Number
- 15239
- Company Category
- Company limited by Shares
- Company Sub Category
- Non-govt company
- Class of Company
- Public
- Date of Incorporation
- 27/09/2002
- Activity
- Manufacture of special purpose machinery
Share capital
- Authorized Capital
- ₹100,000,000.00
- Paid up Capital
- ₹79,500,000.00
Contact details
- l.nagaraju@nyproforbes.com
NYPRO FORBES MOULDS LIMITED is a 21 years old company, incorporated on 27/09/2002. It is classified as Public Non-govt company. Its authorized share capital is ₹100,000,000.00 (₹1,000.00 Lakhs). Its paid up capital is ₹79,500,000.00 (₹795.00 Lakhs).
As per MCA the main line of business is Manufacture of special purpose machinery. Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is U29295TZ2002PLC015239 and its registration number is 15239. It is registered at RoC-Coimbatore. The company is registered with email address l.nagaraju@nyproforbes.com. The company is incorporated with the address SUB DIVISION PLOT NO-52 SIPCOT INDUSTRIAL COMPLEX HOSUR Krishnagiri TN 635126 IN. The current status of the company is Amalgamated.
Directors
Director name | DIN | Designation | Appointment | |
---|---|---|---|---|
AMIT MITTAL | 02292626 | Director | 25/03/2009 | View other directorships |
BORIS LEVIN | 03579210 | Additional Director | 30/06/2011 | View other directorships |
DILIP MAHADEO SANGLE | 03159076 | Director | 09/07/2010 | View other directorships |
ASHOK KUMAR BARAT | 00492930 | Director | 13/08/2007 | View other directorships |
ROBERT WILLIAM WERGE JR | 05113129 | Additional Director | 30/06/2011 | View other directorships |
JOHN DOUGLAS MACINNES | 05151499 | Additional Director | 13/12/2011 | View other directorships |
SHANKAR KRISHNAN SUBRAMANIAN | 03316009 | Additional Director | 13/12/2011 | View other directorships |
Latest Documents
Date | Title | Size |
---|---|---|
10/12/2011 | XBRL document in respect of balance sheet 18-11-2011 for the financial year ending on 31-03-2011.pdf.PDF | ? |
10/12/2011 | XBRL document in respect of profit and loss account 18-11-2011 for the financial year ending on 31-03-2011.pdf.PDF | ? |
18/11/2011 | Form 23AC XBRL-191111-181111 for the FY ending on-310311.OCT | ? |
18/11/2011 | Form 23ACA XBRL-191111-181111 for the FY ending on-310311.OCT | ? |
13/10/2011 | FormSchV-101011 for the FY ending on-310311.OCT | ? |
Similar Companies
Company | CIN | Address |
---|---|---|
SOMESHWAR REALCON PRIVATE LIMITED | U45200MH1972PTC016205 | SURE NO 221/5PATAS ROAD; BARAMATI; Maharashtra; 413102; India |
KAMAL CONSTRUCTION COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED | U45200MH1972PTC016114 | 522 COMMERCE HOUSEMEDOWS STREET MUMBAI MH 400001 IN |
BERG TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED | U45200MH1972PTC015994 | 421 MAKER CHAMBERS VNARIMAN POINT MUMBAI MH 400021 IN |
MASTER BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED | U45200MH1972PTC015586 | 84; VEER NARIMAN ROAD;CHURCHAGATE; MUMBAI- 400 020.; MUMBAI; Maharashtra; 000000; India |
FAQ
The current board member of NYPRO FORBES MOULDS LIMITED are:
- AMIT MITTAL
- BORIS LEVIN
- DILIP MAHADEO SANGLE
- ASHOK KUMAR BARAT
- ROBERT WILLIAM WERGE JR
- JOHN DOUGLAS MACINNES
- SHANKAR KRISHNAN SUBRAMANIAN