Company Overview
Summary of details
- CIN
- U45201RJ1996PLC012205
- Company Status
- Amalgamated
- RoC
- Registration Number
- 12205
- Company Category
- Company limited by shares
- Company Sub Category
- Indian Non-Government Company
- Class of Company
- Public Company
- Date of Incorporation
- 20/06/1996
- Activity
- Construction
Share capital
- Authorized Capital
- ₹100,000,000.00
- Paid up Capital
- ₹10,000,000.00
Contact details
- avkasltd_jp1@rediffmail.com
Rajasthan avas vikas and infrastructure limited is a 28 years old company, incorporated on 20/06/1996. It is classified as Public Indian Non-Government Company. Its authorized share capital is ₹100,000,000.00 (₹1,000.00 Lakhs). Its paid up capital is ₹10,000,000.00 (₹100.00 Lakhs).
As per MCA the main line of business is Construction. Corporate Identification Number (CIN) is U45201RJ1996PLC012205 and its registration number is 12205. The company is registered with email address avkasltd_jp1@rediffmail.com. The company is incorporated with the address 4-SA-24; JAWAHAR NAGAR; JAIPUR; Rajasthan; 302004; India. The current status of the company is Amalgamated.
Directors
Director name | DIN | Designation | Appointment | |
---|---|---|---|---|
SURESH CHANDRA DINKER | 01471998 | Nominee Director | 12/09/2012 | View other directorships |
SIDDHARTH MAHAJAN | 03349759 | Nominee Director | 31/03/2014 | View other directorships |
ABHAY KUMAR | 02389148 | Nominee Director | 04/09/2013 | View other directorships |
SHIKHAR AGRAWAL | 01093773 | Nominee Director | 31/03/2014 | View other directorships |
KAILASH CHAND MEENA | 06435806 | Nominee Director | 16/06/2012 | View other directorships |
RAJENDRA KUMAR AGARWAL | 06841528 | Managing Director | 01/10/2015 | View other directorships |
PURUSHOTTAM BIYANI | 06972500 | Nominee Director | 28/10/2014 | View other directorships |
RAJPAL SINGH SHEKHAWAT | 07064467 | Director | 05/02/2015 | View other directorships |
OM PRAKASH SAINI | 00265655 | Nominee Director | 23/06/2015 | View other directorships |
RAVIKANTH TATIPUDI | 05338003 | Nominee Director | 16/06/2012 | View other directorships |
ASHOK JAIN | 01641752 | Nominee Director | 24/07/2014 | View other directorships |
NARESH CHANDER NAKRA | 03115106 | Nominee Director | 28/06/2010 | View other directorships |
Latest Documents
Date | Title | Size |
---|---|---|
16/09/2016 | XBRL document in respect of financial statement 24-02-2016 for the financial year ending on 31-03-2015.pdf.PDF | ? |
24/02/2016 | Form AOC-4 XBRL-250216.OCT | ? |
13/10/2015 | XBRL document in respect of balance sheet 14-08-2015 for the financial year ending on 31-03-2014.pdf.PDF | ? |
13/10/2015 | XBRL document in respect of profit and loss account 14-08-2015 for the financial year ending on 31-03-2014.pdf.PDF | ? |
24/08/2015 | Form66-220815 for the FY ending on-310314.OCT | ? |
Similar Companies
Company | CIN | Address |
---|---|---|
ASHAPURNA BUILDCON LIMITED | U45201RJ1996PLC013034 | 4A, EAST, PATEL NAGAR, CIRCUT HOUSE ROAD, LIC OFFICE KE SAMNE, RATANADA JODHPUR Jodhpur RJ 342011 IN |
GOYAL BUILDCON LIMITED | U45201RJ1996PLC012881 | GOYAL TOWER ROOM NO. 3,TRANSPORT NAGAR, AGRA ROAD JAIPUR C Jaipur RJ 000000 IN |
AMIT COLONIZERS LIMITED | U45201RJ1996PLC012741 | Flat No F-1 at Plot No-E-97 Subhash Marg, C-scheme Jaipur RJ 302001 IN |
BHUWAN CONSTRUCTION LIMITED | U45201RJ1996PLC012740 | KUSHAL BAGHBANSWARA RAJASTHAN. RAJASTHAN. RJ 000000 IN |
ANDERSON WRIGHT TOWERS LIMITED | U45201RJ1996PLC012217 | 4, GOPINATH MARG, JAIPUR RJ 000000 IN |
FAQ
The current board member of Rajasthan avas vikas and infrastructure limited are:
- SURESH CHANDRA DINKER
- SIDDHARTH MAHAJAN
- ABHAY KUMAR
- SHIKHAR AGRAWAL
- KAILASH CHAND MEENA
- RAJENDRA KUMAR AGARWAL
- PURUSHOTTAM BIYANI
- RAJPAL SINGH SHEKHAWAT
- OM PRAKASH SAINI
- RAVIKANTH TATIPUDI
- ASHOK JAIN
- NARESH CHANDER NAKRA